To square two-digit numbers having 5 as the tens digit: ex. 53×53=2809

-Square the ones digit of the number being squared. This yields the last two numbers of the answer. ex. 3×3=_ _ 09

-Square the tens digit (5) of the number being squared, and to this add the ones digit of the number being squared. This yields the first two numbers of the answer. ex. (5×5)+3=28_ _.

Verify 52×52=2704 56×56=3136 59×59=3481 57×57=3249

### Like this:

Like Loading...